TAMIL WELFARE ASSOCIATION (NEWHAM) UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES ADVOCACY/ADVICE/INFORMATION , PROVIDE SERVICES. PROVIDE HUMAN RESOURCES, EDUCATION, TRAINING, THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING OF LIVES, DISABILITY, THE PREVENTION OF RELIEF OF POVERTY, ACCOMMODATION/HOUSING, ARTS/CULTURE/HERITAGE/SCIENCE, ECONOMIC/COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT /EMPLOYMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £73,558 from 1 government contract(s) and £73,558 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 June 1995: Standard registration
- T W A N (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pulendrakumar Gajavathanan | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rakavan Nadarajah | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Showmeya Jivathas | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thabesh Wijayaratnam | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janani Paramsothy | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tharjini Thayaparan | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
VIGNESWARAMOORTHY PONNIAH | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAMALRAJ THIYAGARAJAH | Trustee | 15 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
PUSHPARATNAM CHANDRADAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SINNATHAMBY MUTHUCUMARASAMY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.36k | £267.42k | £198.31k | £162.36k | £247.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £243.85k | £198.90k | £170.69k | £111.92k | £149.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £60.00k | £50.00k | N/A | £203 | £73.56k | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.00k | £165.87k | £6.70k | £203 | £73.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 December 2023 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 November 2023 | 371 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 December 2023 | 405 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 AUGUST 1994
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE PERSONS PRIMARILY OF THE TAMIL COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING THE EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL INTERESTS OF TAMIL SPEAKING PEOPLE RESIDING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY THE PROVISION OF TAMIL LANGUAGE CLASSES LIBRARY FACILITIES CULTURAL AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES. (C) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THOSE WHO NEED THEM BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS IN LIFE. (D) TO PROMOTE THE CULTURAL DEVELOPMENT OF THE TAMIL PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY JOINTLY WORKING WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS HAVING SIMILAR CHARITABLE OBJECTIVES TO THOSE OF THE COMPANY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
602 ROMFORD ROAD
LONDON
E12 5AF
- Phone:
- 02084780577
- Email:
- TWAN@TWAN.ORG.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window