Governing document ALEXANDRA SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1047494

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JUL 1994 AS AMENDED ON 01 JAN 1995 AS AMENDED ON 27 APR 2001 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 2016 as amended on 27 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE SCHOOL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.