Trustees EVERTON PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND
Charity number: 1047531

Charity reporting is overdue by 1561 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Kirbyshaw | Chair | 21 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Paula Hadley | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mark Guest | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Katy Caroline Moss | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mark Fallon | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALISON BOWERS | Trustee | 20 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY HERCOCK | Trustee | 20 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALISON FOSTER | Trustee | 20 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ATWELL | Trustee | 20 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD EVERS | Trustee | 05 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Paul Higginbottom | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE MAHONEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.