THE ROBERT HAMER EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help further the education of all children attending Llanbedr Church in Wales School. In 2011 we helped supplement the school budget and fund new computers for the children to use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Powys
Governance
- 27 June 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Annabelle Elletson | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Jenny Parry | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
DONNA ELIZABETH KATE JONES | Trustee | 05 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MALCOLM THOMAS | Trustee | 25 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
GAVIN JOHN | Trustee | 25 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £733 | £877 | £2.40k | £891 | £2.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.80k | £500 | £5.70k | £6.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 16 February 2025 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 02 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF ALL CHILDREN ATTENDING ST PETER'S SCHOOL LLANBEDR
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Llanbedr C in W School Hamer Trust
Llanbedr
CRICKHOWELL
Powys
NP8 1SR
- Phone:
- 01873810619
- Email:
- office@llanbedr.powys.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window