NORTHAMPTONSHIRE CHILDMINDING ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Professional support to all Ofsted registered childminders, promoting high quality home based childcare through education and training. Support and work in partnership with children and families in every community to ensure that they have access to high quality childcare, enabling children to reach their full potential and keeping them at the heart of all our activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 June 1995: Standard registration
- 12 July 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 12 July 2021: Funds transferred to 1182575 CHILDMINDING UK
- NCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £310.60k | £228.24k | £163.66k | £132.61k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £323.62k | £238.44k | £182.00k | £112.15k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £212.94k | £200.00k | £90.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £60.00k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 30 September 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 08 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 08 October 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH DECEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED 10TH JUNE 2000 AND 25 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 8 YEARS AND PROMOTE THE OBSERVANCE OF GOOD STANDARDS OF CHILDMINDING BY THE PARENTS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND ALL PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING SUCH FACILITIES. (B)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDMINDERS AND OTHER PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 8 YEARS AND TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN, AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window