MASJID AND MADRASAH FAIZ-UL-QURAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE ISLAMIC EDUCATION TO CHILDREN OF THE COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 27 June 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED SAGHIR | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHAEED ZAMAN | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED ZAMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAHMOOD KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDUL RASHID | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED TAJ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED ZAFAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED BASHIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.60k | £108.15k | £133.94k | £124.69k | £119.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.29k | £90.77k | £124.72k | £136.19k | £119.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 15 NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM 2.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO THE TEACHING OF ISLAM.
Area of benefit
EDGBASTON AND WINSON GREEN BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
341 Dudley Road
BIRMINGHAM
B18 4HB
- Phone:
- 01214559873
- Email:
- mmfuq786@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window