THE HORTON KIRBY AND SOUTH DARENTH LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Disseminate knowledge of local history by means of speakers at meetings and producing books and booklets.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
Governance
- 28 June 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM JOHN TERENCE MOYLE | Chair |
|
||||||
SARAH VICTORIA LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA MARY CANNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER FLEWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM JOHN SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.27k | £380 | £0 | £175 | £528 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.47k | £188 | £0 | £462 | £338 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD MAY 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN HISTORY ESPECIALLY THE LOCAL HISTORY OF HORTON KIRBY, SOUTH DARENTH AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS AND TO CARRY OUT, PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY OF THESE AREAS.
Area of benefit
HORTON KIRBY, SOUTH DARENTH AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 HOMEWOOD ROAD
ST. ALBANS
AL1 4BG
- Phone:
- 07541862567
- Email:
- MALCJSCOTT@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window