PARENTS ASSOCIATION OF SANDHURST SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ITEMS AND EXPERIENCES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED FOR BY THE BUDGET ALLOCATED TO THE SCHOOL FROM THE LOCAL AUTHORITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 29 June 1995: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 April 2012: Re-registered
- PASS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirsty McTaggart | Chair | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jones | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.50k | £20.48k | £20.11k | £19.53k | £30.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.31k | £32.74k | £13.06k | £21.45k | £24.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £750 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 31 December 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 29 April 2022 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 March 2021 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED FEB. 1995.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE LEARNING AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED VIA THE BUDGET ALLOCATED TO THE SCHOOL FROM THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED --IN PRACTICE,LEWISHAAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sandhurst Junior School
Minard Road
LONDON
SE6 1NW
- Phone:
- 02086985810
- Email:
- sandallspta@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window