THE CROYDON AND DISTRICT EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity has worked with an affiliated Education Trust to make available the listed NAAFI building and grounds, within the Kenley Conservation area, for a fully operational school .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Croydon
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 29 June 1995: Standard registration
- C A D E T (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILES HARWOOD | Trustee | 22 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN GLASS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.00k | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.84k | £8.42k | £2.72k | £19.60k | £1.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH JUNE 1995 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 5TH DECEMBER 1998.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO PARENTS WHO WISH TO EDUCATE THEIR CHILDREN ; OTHERWISE THAN AT SCHOOL WITHIN THE PROVISIONS OF THE EDUCATION ACT 1944--88 (B) BEYOND COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE; ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHETHER EDUCATIONAL OR OTHERWISE CONNECTED WITH THE BRETHREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED --IN PRACTICE CROYDON AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Lissoms Road
Chipstead
COULSDON
CR5 3LE
- Phone:
- 07848455208
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window