ALLIANCE OF RELIGIONS AND CONSERVATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle activity of the charity is to promote for the public benefit, the protection and preservation of the natural environment throughout the world, in accordance with the religious teachings and beliefs of the major faiths.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2020
Total income includes £45,833 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
- Oxfordshire
- Somerset
- Cambodia
- China
- India
- Indonesia
- Uganda
Governance
- 30 June 1995: Standard registration
- 23 April 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- ARC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £483.69k | £445.90k | £580.00k | £950.74k | £103.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £470.19k | £458.97k | £592.41k | £891.13k | £247.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | £240.04k | £45.83k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £578.42k | £950.23k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £3 | £17 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £1.58k | £494 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £592.41k | £891.13k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 26 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 26 February 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 21 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 21 March 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 12 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | 12 March 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH APRIL 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RELIGIOUS TEACHINGS AND BELIEFS WHICH ENCOURAGE RESPECT FOR NATURE OF TRHE BAHAI FAITH, BUDDHISM, CHRISTIANITY, HINDUISM, ISLAM, JAINISM, JUDAISM, TAOISM, AND SIMILAR TEACHINGS AND BELIEFS OF OTHER WORLD RELIGIONS.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window