MICHAEL AND LESLEY BENNETT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting established charitable institutions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 June 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL BENNETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jane Patricia Gistyn | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Emmanuel Bennett | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY VALERIE BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.02k | £70.63k | £85.91k | £62.10k | £43.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.64k | £62.49k | £65.15k | £51.52k | £32.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 7TH JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
TO OR TOWARDS OR FOR THE BENEFIT OR FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH SHARES AND PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEDEGARS LEA
KENWOOD CLOSE
LONDON
NW3 7JL
- Phone:
- 02084584945
- Email:
- miles1932@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window