Financial history OAKDALE RESIDENTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1047652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.82k £363 £4.57k £1.11k £911
Total expenditure £7.24k £896 £845 £118 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A