LEARNING THROUGH LEISURE WITH HOLIDAY EXPLORERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity offers people who have a learning disability the ideal opportunity to increase their learning, independence and social skills through leisure and holiday activities. Volunteers from the community are recruited, trained and supported by the organisation to offer individual support and friendship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 04 July 1995: Standard registration
- 18 July 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HOLIDAY EXPLORERS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.65k | £137.52k | £148.47k | £100.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.17k | £133.32k | £159.42k | £114.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 18 June 2008 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 16 July 2008 | 167 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 14 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 17 August 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 16 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 16 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 11 August 2005 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 11 August 2005 | 192 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JUNE 1994, JUNE 1995, AND AS AMENDED 21ST APRIL 1997 AND 17TH JUNE 1998 AND 28TH JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF PERSONS IN EAST ANGLIA ( DEFINED AS SUFFOLK, NORFOLK, CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND ESSEX) WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES ("THE BENEFICIARIES") IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAYS FOR THE BENEFICIARIES ALONGSIDE PERSONS WITHOUT LEARNING DISABILITIES AND BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THE COMPANIONS WHO WILL GO ON HOLIDAY WITH THE BENEFICIARIES THUS ENABLING THE BENEFICIARIES TO TAKE HOLIDAYS FOR THEIR RELIEF WHICH THEY WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO HAVE.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK, NORFOLK, CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND ESSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window