THE ERIC EVANS MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support to disadvantaged young persons
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 July 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN MARTINEAU KINDER | Chair |
|
||||||
AMELIA EVANS | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
CYRIL HENRY FLAJSNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £300 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST JULY 1991
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISTCRETION THINK FIT PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISTRETION FOR THE PERIOD OF TWENTY-ONE YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN THE YEAR ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART SUCH INCOME AT COMPOUND INTEREST BY INVESTING THE SAME AND THE RESULTING INCOME IN ANY OF THE AUTHORISED INVESTMENTS AND HOLD THE SAME AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 THORNHILL SQUARE
LONDON
N1 1BE
- Phone:
- 02076099026
- Email:
- info@ericevanstrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window