Financial history BETHEL UNITED CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST APOSTOLIC U.K.

Charity number: 1047717
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.15m £716.96k £1.01m £937.83k £877.81k
Total expenditure £1.09m £780.59k £993.85k £738.71k £1.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £120.02k £31.14k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £543.00k £586.08k £765.94k £549.16k £470.86k
Income - Other trading activities £149.70k £25.02k £114.53k £204.54k £318.02k
Income - Charitable activities £349.31k £36.95k £41.88k £92.96k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £104.26k £68.91k £84.18k £91.16k £88.93k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.09m £780.59k £993.85k £738.71k £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.50k £7.21k £0 £0 £8.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0