Financial history RAYNET-UK

Charity number: 1047725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.28k £17.07k £14.27k £7.51k £19.22k
Total expenditure £13.24k £12.67k £14.74k £13.85k £11.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A