Trustees RAYNET-UK
Charity number: 1047725

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS CATHY CLARK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr David Eason Morgan | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julian Mason Shaw | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jon Stephen Procee | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Michael Mobbs | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edmund McCrystal | Trustee | 27 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Whitehead | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Greg Mossop | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas | Trustee | 21 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.