THE SHREWSBURY FURNITURE SCHEME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Shrewsbury Furniture Scheme collects donated furniture, electrical and other household goods in good condition from people in Shrewsbury and the surrounding area. The items are then re-used and provided to individuals and families whom are unemployed,on a low income or in receipt of benefits. This project is not open to serve the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Shropshire
Governance
- 10 July 1995: Standard registration
- 12 January 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 12 January 2020: Funds transferred to 1179323 THE SHREWSBURY FURNITURE SCHEME
- SHREWSBURY FURNITURE SCHEME (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.12k | £143.58k | £137.89k | £150.90k | £155.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.35k | £127.73k | £139.22k | £152.19k | £160.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £9.71k | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.96k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 14 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 14 August 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 04 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 04 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 21 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 21 September 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 24 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 24 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/02/1994 AS AMENDED ON 25/05/1995 AS AMENDED ON 25/09/2003 AS AMENDED ON 01/10/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE ENVIRONMENT, BY: (A) PROVIDING RELIEF FOR NEEDY OR DISTRESSED PERSONS RESIDENT IN SHREWSBURY, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY THE PROVISION TO THEM OF ESSENTIAL FURNITURE, AND HOUSEHOLD AND ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT (B) COLLECTING SUCH DONATED FURNITURE AND EQUIPMENT FOR CHECKING, REPAIRING, REFURBISHING, STORING AND SUBSEQUENT SUPPLY (C) RECYCLING, RE-USING, RENOVATING AND REPAIRING FURNITURE, HOUSEHOLD AND ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT WHICH WOULD OTHERWISE BE DISPOSED OF AS LANDFILL (D) EMPOWERING THE UNEMPLOYED AND OTHERS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS, PROVIDING THEM WITH OPPORTUNITIES TO ACQUIRE AND PRACTISE SKILLS BOTH TO GAIN CONFIDENCE AND CONTRIBUTE TO THE COMMUNITY BY ESTABLISHING VOLUNTEER TRAINING SCHEMES TO UNDERTAKE REPAIR AND REFURBISHMENT FOR RE-CYCLING (E) EDUCATING AND INFORMING THE PUBLIC ABOUT SUSTAINABLE LIFESTYLES AND THE BENEFITS TO THE COMMUNITY OF RECYCLING, RE-USE AND ENVIRONMENTALLY FRIENDLY WASTE MANAGEMENT.
Area of benefit
SHREWSBURY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window