Trustees HODSOLL STREET AND RIDLEY VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1047779

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Pollard | Chair | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Derek Rutherford | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Josephine Shreeve | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Samuels | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
GARY DIXON | Trustee | 17 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD GILROY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN WEST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.