Accounts and annual returns FIRST STEPS PARENT AND TODDLER GROUP

Charity Number: 1047843
Charity reporting is overdue by 1785 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 324 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 324 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 690 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 690 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1055 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1055 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1420 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1420 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1785 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1785 days