Financial history THE WOODLANDS ACADEMY (SCARBOROUGH) FUND

Charity number: 1047866
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £9.88k £47.12k £17.35k £11.62k £15.20k
Total expenditure £22.18k £63.27k £26.05k £14.49k £10.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £1.14k