Accounts and annual returns MUDDY WELLIES EARLY LEARNERS

Charity number: 1047870
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 September 2019 12 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 16 September 2018 12 January 2020 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 16 September 2017 22 August 2018 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 16 September 2016 05 September 2017 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 September 2016 Not Required