Financial history BLUNDELLSANDS KINDERGARTEN PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1047898
Charity reporting is up to date (240 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £193.29k £198.26k £199.09k £190.29k £200.96k
Total expenditure £206.47k £173.53k £173.53k £208.48k £234.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £13.96k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A