Accounts and annual returns FREDERICK GOUGH PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1047905
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2013 28 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2012 31 October 2013 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 28 July 2014 363 days late