Financial history MILTON MOUNT PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1047936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £141.77k £123.87k £149.19k £158.96k £158.60k
Total expenditure £148.34k £131.10k £147.94k £154.88k £155.64k
Income from government contracts £122.76k N/A £134.09k £145.63k £141.63k
Income from government grants N/A £115.92k N/A N/A N/A