CYSWLLT CONTACT LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Day services for substance misusers. Including: - CBT counselling - 12-step treatment & aftercare - Awareness raising group for those still using Support for those affected by another's use of drugs & alcohol (group & counselling) Peer Mentoring for those affected by substance misuse Specilist counselling for people with eating disorders Online advice & info www.recovery.org.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £175,437 from government contract(s) and £84,162 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- Pembrokeshire
- Powys
Governance
- 13 July 1995: Standard registration
- 12 May 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 12 May 2016: Funds transferred to 265008 BAROD PROJECT
- THE CENTRE FOR RECOVERY (Working name)
- CYSWLLT CEREDIGION CONTACT LTD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.15m | £1.08m | £711.01k | £761.76k | £428.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £785.50k | £781.14k | £771.22k | £754.04k | £417.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £175.44k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £84.16k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £437.65k | £729.04k | £120.42k | £121.11k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £716.22k | £656.03k | £588.43k | £640.52k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £236 | £113 | £67 | £129 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £796 | £980 | £2.10k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £721.82k | £755.63k | £738.72k | £741.51k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £21.59k | £15.51k | £18.43k | £12.53k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £13 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 05 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 08 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 16 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2014
(These accounts |
16 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 20 May 2014 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | 23 December 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED 9 APRIL 2003.
Charitable objects
TO ADVISE AND ASSIST PERSONS WITH ALCOHOL OR DRUGS RELATED OR CONNECTED PERSONAL PROBLEMS IN OVERCOMING THOSE PROBLEMS;TO ASSIST THE FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS ;TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC WITH THE USE AND MISUSE OF DRUGS,ALCOHOL AND OTHER SUBSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE CEREDIGION
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window