Financial history DERBY SHOPMOBILITY

Charity number: 1047969
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £47.49k £43.76k £46.56k £52.13k £49.78k
Total expenditure £51.49k £45.39k £43.06k £49.02k £41.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A