COBHAM COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate a sessional pre-school on five days a week in a village community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £55,035 from 1 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 19 July 1995: Standard registration
- COBHAM COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kerian Cater | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Zammit | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daljinder Upple | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Barnard | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Charlotte Newnes | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Joy Smith | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Rose | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Hopperton | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Anne Sheppard | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Bourne | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.25k | £83.94k | £88.07k | £105.68k | £95.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.31k | £81.52k | £77.79k | £96.96k | £95.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £70.67k | £60.32k | £52.79k | £64.06k | £55.04k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST OCTOBER 1986
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEED OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cobham Community Pre-School
The Meadow Rooms
The Street
Cobham
Kent
DA12 3BZ
- Phone:
- 07562 666408
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window