Accounts and annual returns CONWY & DENBIGHSHIRE NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUNDS UMBRELLA CHARITY AND OTHER RELATED CHARITIES

Charity number: 1047989
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 31 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 19 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 13 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 03 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 16 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 17 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 05 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 15 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 25 January 2007 On Time