New Earth Theatre Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
New Earth Theatre presents and develops work with British East and South East Asian (BESEA) artists that asks key questions of identity, of the world we live in and our place in that world. They produce touring plays and readings across the year, as well as nurture BESEA talent through their Academy acting and writing courses and Professional Writers Programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 July 1995: Standard registration
- YELLOW EARTH THEATRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WAI MUN YOON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Leo Marcus Wan | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grace Oon Hooi Ng | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kai-Chuan Chao | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SHANNON | Trustee | 10 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MANINDER GILL | Trustee | 26 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £311.35k | £273.14k | £289.23k | £286.94k | £379.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.94k | £207.37k | £294.10k | £422.00k | £322.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH APRIL 1995 as amended on 21 Jan 2019 as amended on 02 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
(A)THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN DRAMATIC ART, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE STAGING OF PRODUCTIONS WHICH COMBINE THEATRICAL STYLES OF THE FAR EAST AND WESTERN EUROPE. (B)TO EMPLOY STAFF AND/OR AGENTS, AND TO MAKE PROVISION FOR THE PROPER REMUNERATION OF ANY SUCH PERSONS INCLUDING POWER TO MAKE ALL REASONABLE AND NECESSARY PROVISION FOR THE PAYMENT OF PENSIONS AND SUPERANNUATION TO OR ON BEHALF OF EMPLOYEES AND THEIR WIDOWS WIDOWERS AND OTHER DEPENDENTS. (C)TO ESTABLISH, OPERATE AND MAINTAIN OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH OTHERS IN ESTABLISHING, OPERATING AND MAINTAINING AT SUCH PLACES AS MAY BE DEEMED APPROPRIATE BY THE ASSOCIATION ANY DINING AND REFRESHMENT ROOMS, STALLS AND FACILITIES FOR THE SUPPLY THEREAT OF FOOD, DRINK AND REFRESHMENTS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS PROVIDED THAT SUCH FOOD, DRINK OR REFRESHMENTS SHALL ONLY BE AVAILABLE TO PERSONS PARTICIPATING IN THE ACTIVITIES OF THE ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Mayton Street
London
N7 6QR
- Phone:
- 020 8694 6631
- Email:
- admin@newearththeatre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window