INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS AND ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IPEM promotes physics and engineering applied to medicine and biology by organising scientific meetings; developing educational materials for specialists and the public; accrediting people, courses and training centres; publishing reports and journals promoting scientific knowledge and best practice; encouraging research and innovation; developing and maintaining professional standards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,776,783
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.72m | |
Other trading activities | £33.77k | |
Investments | £19.01k | |
Other | £2.11k |
Total expenditure:
£1,943,913
Raising funds | £27.86k | |
Charitable activities | £1.92m | |
Other | £0 |
£263,081 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £27.86k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.92m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £27.86k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.92m | |
Retained for future use | £95.95k |
People

23 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
450 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 July 1995: Standard registration
- I P E M (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Richard Wilde | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fiammetta Fedele | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Brian Knight | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Arthur Dunn | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jason Neville Wilde | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carl Graham Rowbottom | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ayyakkannu Manivannan | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Pauline Barnes-McKenzie | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Celia Jolliffe | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.52m | £1.55m | £1.65m | £1.61m | £1.78m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.27m | £1.25m | £1.30m | £1.57m | £1.94m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £50.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.00k | N/A | £19.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £253.17k | £267.75k | £277.60k | £274.33k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £60.31k | £34.57k | £22.59k | £31.60k | £33.77k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.20m | £1.24m | £1.35m | £1.23m | £1.72m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £11.32k | £9.47k | £3.69k | £7.67k | £19.01k | |
|
Income - Other | £805 | £420 | £2.56k | £60.11k | £2.11k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.25m | £1.24m | £1.29m | £1.57m | £1.92m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £17.83k | £10.36k | £1.38k | £3.29k | £27.86k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £91.32k | £131.93k | £129.67k | £89.67k | £30.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £45.93k | £55.54k | £36.22k | £82.88k | £5.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.29k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £427.68k | £406.10k | £460.20k | £547.22k | £887.11k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.46m | £1.74m | £2.42m | £2.10m | £2.36m | |
|
Other assets | £1.39m | £1.79m | £1.74m | £1.75m | £1.30m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £211.70k | £212.92k | £235.51k | £392.37k | £416.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 JULY 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2 SEPTEMBER 1997 AND 7 JULY 2009. as amended on 03 Sep 2013 as amended on 21 Sep 2020 as amended on 20 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF PHYSICS AND ENGINEERING APPLIED TO MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY AND TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE FIELD
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS & ENGINEERING
IN MEDICINE
FAIRMOUNT HOUSE
230 TADCASTER ROAD
YORK
YO24 1ES
- Phone:
- 01904610821
- Email:
- office@ipem.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window