THE ENSIGN YOUTH CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
After School Club/Senior Youth Club Activities for young people during Easter, Half Term And Summer holidays Community Sessions Employment Project Health Project
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 19 July 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUJIBUR RAHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUHED AKLAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MUHAMMED ASHRAF MUJAHID | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.84k | £95.72k | £105.76k | £120.73k | £76.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.87k | £60.78k | £81.52k | £65.75k | £76.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.12k | £25.77k | N/A | £20.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27TH JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION IN LIFE. (B)TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE ESPECIALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES TO DEVELO[P THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS
Contact information
- Address:
-
ENSIGN YOUTH CLUB
WELLCLOSE SQUARE
LONDON
E1 8HY
- Phone:
- 02077023340
- Email:
- info@ensign.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window