CHALLOCK VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recreational
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 19 July 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY MICHAEL FREEMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Donna Joanne Ashby | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Stuart | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John David Saunders | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Anthony Jones | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT FRAMPTON-FELL | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachelle Riley | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Arthur Worger | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|||||
JAMES ERNEST WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Anthony Aitken | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.87k | £22.48k | £17.70k | £13.45k | £15.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.32k | £4.84k | £10.63k | £11.52k | £21.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.19k | £11.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 March 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 21ST SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CHALLOCK IN THE COUNTY OF KENT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHALLOCK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mdina
Canterbury Road
Challock
ASHFORD
Kent
TN25 4BJ
- Phone:
- 01233740408
- Email:
- worger.three@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window