Trustees THEATRE-RITES

Charity Number: 1048058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ELIZABETH ANN LYNCH FRSA Chair 28 April 2015
None on record
Natasha Kathi-Chandra Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Laura Van Wymersch Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Brigitte Adela Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Katrina Duncan Trustee 07 January 2020
None on record
Hannah Victoria Murphy Trustee 09 December 2019
None on record
Liam Jarvis Trustee 31 January 2014
None on record
ROGER NELSON Trustee
None on record