WILDLIFE INFORMATION NETWORK

Charity number: 1048059
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity provides scientific and veterinary information on the health and management of wild animals, and emerging infectious diseases, to wildlife professionals and decison-makers worldwide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009

Total income: £104,786
Total expenditure: £64,714

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Afghanistan
  • Akrotiri
  • Albania
  • Algeria
  • American Samoa
  • Andorra
  • Angola
  • Anguilla
  • Antarctica
  • Antigua And Barbuda
  • Argentina
  • Armenia
  • Aruba
  • Australia
  • Austria
  • Azerbaijan
  • Bahrain
  • Bangladesh
  • Barbados
  • Belarus
  • Belgium
  • Belize
  • Benin
  • Bermuda
  • Bhutan
  • Bolivia
  • Bosnia And Herzegovina
  • Botswana
  • Brazil
  • British Indian Ocean Territory
  • British Virgin Islands
  • Brunei
  • Bulgaria
  • Burkina Faso
  • Burma
  • Burundi
  • Cambodia
  • Cameroon
  • Canada
  • Cape Verde
  • Cayman Islands
  • Central African Republic
  • Chad
  • Chile
  • China
  • Christmas Island
  • Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
  • Colombia
  • Comoros
  • Congo
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Cook Islands
  • Costa Rica
  • Croatia
  • Cuba
  • Cyprus
  • Czech Republic
  • Denmark
  • Dhekelia
  • Djibouti
  • Dominica
  • Dominican Republic
  • Easter Island
  • East Timor
  • Ecuador
  • Egypt
  • El Salvador
  • Equatorial Guinea
  • Eritrea
  • Estonia
  • Eswatini
  • Ethiopia
  • Falkland Islands
  • Faroe Islands
  • Fiji
  • Finland
  • France
  • French Guiana
  • French Polynesia
  • Gabon
  • Georgia
  • Germany
  • Ghana
  • Gibraltar
  • Greece
  • Greenland
  • Grenada
  • Guadeloupe
  • Guam
  • Guatemala
  • Guernsey
  • Guinea
  • Guinea-bissau
  • Guyana
  • Haiti
  • Honduras
  • Hong Kong
  • Hungary
  • Iceland
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Iran
  • Iraq
  • Ireland
  • Isle Of Man
  • Israel
  • Italy
  • Ivory Coast
  • Jamaica
  • Japan
  • Jersey
  • Jordan
  • Kazakhstan
  • Kenya
  • Kiribati
  • Kosovo
  • Kuwait
  • Kyrgyzstan
  • Laos
  • Latvia
  • Lebanon
  • Lesotho
  • Liberia
  • Libya
  • Liechtenstein
  • Lithuania
  • Luxembourg
  • Macau
  • Macedonia
  • Madagascar
  • Malawi
  • Malaysia
  • Maldives
  • Mali
  • Malta
  • Marshall Islands
  • Martinique
  • Mauritania
  • Mauritius
  • Mayotte
  • Mexico
  • Micronesia
  • Moldova
  • Monaco
  • Mongolia
  • Montenegro
  • Montserrat
  • Morocco
  • Mozambique
  • Namibia
  • Nauru
  • Nepal
  • Netherlands
  • New Caledonia
  • New Zealand
  • Nicaragua
  • Niger
  • Nigeria
  • Niue
  • Norfolk Island
  • Northern Ireland
  • Northern Mariana Islands
  • North Korea
  • Norway
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Oman
  • Pakistan
  • Palau
  • Panama
  • Papua New Guinea
  • Paraguay
  • Peru
  • Philippines
  • Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
  • Poland
  • Portugal
  • Puerto Rico
  • Qatar
  • Réunion
  • Romania
  • Russia
  • Rwanda
  • Saint Barthélemy
  • Saint Helena
  • Saint Pierre And Miquelon
  • Saint Vincent
  • Samoa
  • San Marino
  • São Tomé And Principe
  • Saudi Arabia
  • Scotland
  • Senegal
  • Serbia
  • Seychelles
  • Sierra Leone
  • Singapore
  • Sint Maarten
  • Slovakia
  • Slovenia
  • Solomon Islands
  • Somalia
  • South Africa
  • South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
  • South Korea
  • Spain
  • Sri Lanka
  • St Kitts And Nevis
  • St Lucia
  • Sudan
  • Suriname
  • Svalbard And Jan Mayen
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • Syria
  • Taiwan
  • Tajikistan
  • Tanzania
  • Thailand
  • The Bahamas
  • The Gambia
  • Togo
  • Tokelau
  • Tonga
  • Trinidad And Tobago
  • Tunisia
  • Turkey
  • Turkmenistan
  • Turks And Caicos Islands
  • Tuvalu
  • Uganda
  • Ukraine
  • United Arab Emirates
  • United States
  • United States Virgin Islands
  • Uruguay
  • Uzbekistan
  • Vanuatu
  • Venezuela
  • Vietnam
  • Wallis And Futuna
  • Yemen
  • Zambia
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 July 1995: Standard registration
  • 12 October 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • W I N (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2005 31/01/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £77.75k £98.42k £118.62k £42.31k £104.79k
Total expenditure £137.11k £97.03k £75.05k £82.53k £64.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 31 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 04 November 2010 4 days late
Annual return 31 December 2008 05 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 06 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 27 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 04 August 2008 On Time