Trustees LUTTERWORTH AND DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity Number: 1048089
Up to date (32 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Martin Mitchell | Chair | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Agnes Stella Spragg | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ann Stannard | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Coburn | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HANSFORD | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Jane Rosemary Clark | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Cottrell | Trustee | 29 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Anne Rogers | Trustee | 29 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Candy Jane Smith | Trustee | 25 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.