MAGIC LANTERN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Magic Lantern runs interactive art history workshops in schools and a range of adult groups including prisons, homeless centres and hospices. We show that anyone can understand and enjoy art. We also show how art can enhance and bring to life any curriculum subject or topic and can help develop a range of life skills including problem solving, critical thinking, communication and confidence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 August 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH ANN WOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Allison Murdoch | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Josepha Sanna | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Sanders | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
DIANA SCHOMBERG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LOUISE ALEXANDRA VARLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ANDY SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.15k | £42.38k | £31.30k | £49.25k | £39.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.52k | £26.81k | £43.17k | £36.06k | £40.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH JUNE 1995.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC,AND SCHOOL CHILDREN IN PARTICULAR,IN PAINTING AND FINE ART ESPECIALLY,BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY,THROUGH THE USE OF SLIDE PRESENTATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 The Builders Yard (Nanyuki)
Shaftesbury Road
East Knoyle
SALISBURY
SP3 6AR
- Phone:
- 07788136434
- Email:
- info@magiclanternart.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window