NOW! CHARITY GROUP LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Now! is a community-led charity. Our flagship household services reduce waste and carbon footprint via reusing and recycling hundreds of tonnes of household items. Whilst our social inclusion activities maximise our social impact through multiple 'Projects for Good'. These are local support initiatives which are driven to achieve transformation for people at risk of exclusion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£712,604
Donations and legacies | £19.33k | |
Charitable activities | £669.21k | |
Other trading activities | £15.60k | |
Investments | £8.47k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£762,241
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £572.98k | |
Other | £189.27k |
£6,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £18,952 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £189.27k | |
Charitable expenditure | £572.98k |
People

19 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 02 August 1995: Standard registration
- FURNITURE NOW (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon Sims | Chair | 23 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Grant | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Carter | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Andrew Whines | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Cutress | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £582.55k | £732.58k | £624.60k | £745.48k | £712.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £551.49k | £520.22k | £566.28k | £755.40k | £762.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £208.36k | £106.57k | N/A | £18.95k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £64.00k | £181.71k | £205.44k | £90.77k | £19.33k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £14.12k | £15.53k | £0 | £12.92k | £15.60k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £503.99k | £377.63k | £402.01k | £639.34k | £669.21k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £448 | £348 | £1.07k | £2.45k | £8.47k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £157.36k | £16.09k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £551.24k | £352.61k | £364.25k | £755.10k | £572.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £251 | £165 | £30 | £300 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £3.61k | £4.72k | £2.48k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £20.00k | £17.17k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £167.44k | £202.00k | £0 | £189.27k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.94k | £4.04k | £13.28k | £97.20k | £1.16k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £89.03k | |
|
Other assets | £142.99k | £350.61k | £427.01k | £339.75k | £269.21k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £10.49k | £5.83k | £33.15k | £39.74k | £11.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 February 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 February 2024 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 JUL 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JUN 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 SEP 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN SOUTH EAST ENGLAND WITH FURNITURE AND HOUSEHOLD NECESSITIES OF ALL DESCRIPTIONS AND TO PROVIDE THE TRANSPORT FACILITIES TO MOVE THESE NECESSITIES BETWEEN ACCOMMODATION AND SITES. (B) TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION AND SKILLS OF PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE ABOVE AREA, IN (1) THE ARTS AND TECHNIQUES OF THE REFURBISHMENT OF FURNITURE AND HOUSEHOLD GOODS; OR (2) ANY OTHER DISCIPLINES THAT WILL ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO RECOVER CONFIDENCE, GAIN NEW SKILLS OR BECOME BETTER SOCIALISED, TO ENABLE THEM TO PROGRESS TOWARDS VOLUNTEERING EDUCATION OR PAID WORK. (C) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY [I] THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES AND THE PROVISION OF RECYCLING AND REUSE FACILITIES [II]ADVANCING PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS RELATED TO SUSTAINABLE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES IN REGARDS TO HOUSEHOLD AND COMMERCIAL/INDUSTRIAL WASTE (III) CARRYING OUT RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT INTO SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH (IV) PROMOTING AND INCREASING REUSE OF FURNITURE, ELECTRICS AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD MATERIALS/ITEMS THROUGH THE FULFILMENT OF THE OBJECTIVES IN 3A ABOVE.
Area of benefit
SOUTH EAST ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Now! Charity Group Ltd
Furniture Now
1 Sketch Place
Brooks Road
Lewes East Sussex
BN7 2YG
- Phone:
- 01273487377
- Email:
- hello@nowcharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window