Financial history NAKAYOSHI KAI - THE JAPANESE FRIENDSHIP GROUP

Charity number: 1048115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.71k £2.11k £2.59k £3.29k £14.37k
Total expenditure £2.29k £2.55k £2.97k £3.06k £14.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A