LIFECRAFT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For members Lifecraft provides activity groups, counselling, social club, meals, newsletter and opportunities for volunteering and employment. For members and the wider community we have an information centre, website, telephone helpline and handbook of mental health services. Lifecraft supports user involvement in service development and campaigns to raise awareness of mental health issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £289,859 from 5 government contract(s) and £51,929 from 5 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 24 July 1995: Standard registration
- 24 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 24 January 2025: Funds transferred to 1195632 LIFECRAFT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £338.70k | £243.46k | £342.67k | £423.46k | £350.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £242.92k | £279.19k | £296.34k | £369.31k | £587.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £172.82k | £192.52k | £196.80k | £318.11k | £289.86k | |
|
Income from government grants | £31.36k | N/A | £59.18k | £41.80k | £51.93k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH JUNE 1995 AMENDED 6 JANUARY 2006 AND 3 OCTOBER 2008. AS AMENDED ON 03 OCT 2014 AS AMENDED ON 14 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND SUPPORT PEOPLE WITH A MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEM,IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF : A FORUM IN WHICH USER AND EX-USERS OF MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES CAN SUPPORT EACH OTHER . INFORMATION ABOUT MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEM AND TREATMENT TO THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL AND,IN PARTICULAR,TO USERS OF MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES AND THEIR FRIENDS AND RELATIVES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window