THE TRINITY CENTRE (DALSTON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing: support to children and their families through outreach and family development activities, education and recreational opportunities for children and young people, a safe secure and accessible community space.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 July 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Laura Luz | Trustee | 10 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Sinead Ni Lanagain | Trustee | 10 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Payne | Trustee | 10 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Arseni Brabbs | Trustee | 10 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.44k | £62.31k | £11.86k | £24.92k | £34.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.67k | £35.60k | £69.49k | £72.16k | £51.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 February 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 6TH JULY 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF HACKNEY AND ISLINGTON, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING ; THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION; AND THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY AND ISLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRINITY CENTRE (DALSTON)
BEECHWOOD ROAD
LONDON
E8 3DY
- Phone:
- 02072496061
- Website:
-
thetrinitycentredalston.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window