Trustees NORTH COCKERINGTON C E PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND
Charity Number: 1048149

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jon Savage | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lara Oldfield | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caitlin Green | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Becky Dhami | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Manders | Trustee | 31 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Stratford | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.