Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1048159
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 12 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 July 2024 255 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required