Financial history DULWICH FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1048164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £78.84k £15.08k £12.32k £87.91k £126.58k
Total expenditure £79.29k £15.53k £17.52k £82.11k £119.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £21.76k £6.00k £5.00k £6.00k £8.25k