NORFOLK AND NORWICH HOSPITALS CHARITY

Charity number: 1048170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We support even better care at the Norfolk & Norwich, Cromer and Jenny Lind Children's Hospitals. Donations enable us to offer much more than NHS funding alone can provide. We fund medical equipment, specialist staff, research projects, improvements to the hospital environment and more to improve the comfort and care of patients, visitors and staff. Visit nnhospitalscharity.org.uk for more info

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 February 1997: Standard registration
  • 23 April 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Jenny Lind Children's Hospital Charity (Working name)
  • N&N HOSPITALS CHARITY (Working name)
  • NORFOLK AND NORWICH HEALTH CARE NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
  • NORFOLK AND NORWICH UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
  • NORFOLK AND NORWICH UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Norfolk & Norwich University Hospitals NHS Foundation Trust Trustee 06 September 1995
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.46m £1.80m £2.38m £2.59m £3.30m
Total expenditure £3.33m £1.81m £3.42m £3.76m £3.01m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.09m £1.59m £2.07m £2.27m £2.88m
Income - Other trading activities £15.33k £91 £14.36k £43.35k £53.12k
Income - Charitable activities £43.27k £10.91k £62.47k £45.55k £87.71k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £242.65k £185.40k £229.08k £201.20k £242.38k
Income - Other £73.86k £13.28k £9.82k £27.51k £38.58k
Income - Legacies £291.98k £430.24k £978.54k £1.17m £1.48m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.22m £1.68m £3.23m £3.60m £2.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £109.52k £126.63k £195.68k £163.44k £246.85k
Expenditure - Governance £10.96k £50.37k £54.63k £61.29k £60.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.54m £3.03m £3.13m £2.57m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £876 £816 £804 £1.26k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £23.08k £8.83k £191.58k £189.57k £136.75k
Long-term investments £8.01m £9.63m £8.71m £8.07m £8.69m
Other assets £2.96m £2.38m £3.05m £4.55m £5.24m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.02m £330.90k £586.88k £3.12m £3.63m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED ON 16/8/1995
Charitable objects
TO FUND ANY SPECIAL PROJECT OR TO PURCHASE OR CONSTRUCT ANY BUILDING OR BUILDINGS TO PURCHASE SPECIALIST MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FOR THE COMFORT TREATMENT AND CARE OF THE SICK PEOPLE OF NORFOLK AND NORWICH TREATED AT THE NORFOLK AND NORWICH HOSPITAL OR ASSOCIATED HOSPITALS IN THE VICINITY OF NORWICH.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK AND NORWICH
Registration history
  • 28 February 1997 : Standard registration
  • 23 April 2009 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Norfolk & Norwich University
Hospital
Colney Lane
Norwich
NR4 7UY
Phone:
01603287107