Financial history EASTBOURNE AREA PARENTS'ACTION GROUP

Charity number: 1048192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £422.65k £352.91k £332.40k £396.18k £358.73k
Total expenditure £405.79k £284.71k £392.07k £415.26k £360.82k
Income from government contracts N/A £201.88k £131.59k £196.08k £204.72k
Income from government grants £214.18k £55.89k £3.79k N/A N/A