Trustees EASTBOURNE AREA PARENTS'ACTION GROUP

Charity number: 1048192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL ASKEW Chair 06 April 2011
None on record
Jill Margaret Shacklock Trustee 29 June 2021
None on record
Natasha Roberts Trustee 31 July 2019
None on record
Paul John Vallet Trustee 31 July 2019
None on record
Pamela Robotham Trustee 11 April 2019
None on record
Marylyn Jane Fellows-Poole Trustee 16 August 2018
None on record
Ann Newton-Marcial Trustee 17 August 2016
None on record