Reeth and Gunnerside School Fund

Charity number: 1048198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides additional educational activities for the children. Is a joint school fund "Reeth and Gunnerside School Fund" supporting both Reeth Community and Gunnerside Methodist (VC) Federated Primary Schools.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £14,564
Total expenditure: £20,734

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 July 1995: Standard registration
  • 13 June 2011: Funds received from 1058518 GUNNERSIDE SCHOOL FUND
  • 08 March 2022: Funds received from 1054834 THE FRIENDS OF GUNNERSIDE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Reeth and Gunnerside School Fund (Working name)
  • REETH SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRENDA PRICE Chair 04 June 2012
None on record
Jessica Holliday Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Rev Melanie Reed Trustee 17 October 2022
None on record
Thomas Fremlin Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Jacqueline McCartney Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Michael Keenan Trustee 19 October 2017
None on record
Richard Sharp Trustee 23 May 2016
None on record
Sadie Bainbridge Trustee 17 May 2016
None on record
GORDON STAINSBY Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
KEITH WEBSTER Trustee 04 June 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.86k £419 £5.65k £13.09k £14.56k
Total expenditure £14.23k £476 £2.43k £10.37k £20.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Reeth and Gunnerside Schools
Healaugh Road
Reeth
Richmond
North Yorkshire
DL11 6SP
Phone:
01748884308
Website:

No information available