REGNUM (WEST SUSSEX) CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANT SCHEME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the stress experienced by carers and people with physical mental or sensory impairment within the family or home by offering a respite service through the provision of community based care attendants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 25 July 1995: Standard registration
- 23 April 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 23 April 2009: Funds transferred to 1127236 CROSSROADS CARE SOUTH CENTRAL LTD
- REGNUM CROSSROADS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236.83k | £236.92k | £253.73k | £277.83k | £253.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £221.80k | £220.84k | £216.88k | £227.92k | £264.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 26 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 10 September 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 29 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 05 September 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 19 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 06 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND MARCH 1995.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS EXPERIENCED BY CARERS AND PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL,MENTAL OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT WITHIN THE FAMILY OR HOME BY OFFERING A RESPITE SERVICE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY BASED CARE ATTENDANT. OR AT THE DISCRETION OF THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE AND IN EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES TO PROVIDE SUCH CARE ATTENDANTS FOR SUCH DISABLED PERSONS LIVING ALONE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window