Accounts and annual returns THE CHINGFORD SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION (C.S.P.A.)

Charity number: 1048262
Charity reporting is overdue by 703 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 337 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 337 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 703 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 703 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 March 2022 297 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 22 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required